Dalton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephanie E Dalton
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00443
Filed: February 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/7/2018 DENYING 16 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING 21 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment is entered for the Commissioner. CASE CLOSED. (Fabillaran, J)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/14/17 GRANTING Extension of time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment to 1/5/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/20/17: The time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment shall be extended until December 18, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME for defendant's response to Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/28/17. The New due date will be 10/27/17.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/30/17: Defendant shall have a first extension of time of 30 days to file her motion for summary judgment. (Kaminski, H)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/6/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve scheduling order in social security cases. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the U.S. Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie E Dalton
Represented By: Antonio S. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?