Easley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Roy Eugene Easley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00475
Filed: March 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/23/18 DENYING plaintiff's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING the Commissioner's 22 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/25/2017 ORDERING that the time for defendant to file her opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is CONTINUED to 11/23/2017. (Zignago, K.)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/1/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Summary Judgment by 10/4/2017. (Michel, G.)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/7/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment brief is EXTENDED through 9/4/2017. (Washington, S) Modified on 8/7/2017 (Washington, S).
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/7/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's 3 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal (USM). Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the required documents for service, and shall a statement with the court that such documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (cc: USM) (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Eugene Easley
Represented By: Joseph Clayton Fraulob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel Adam Lazar
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?