Sharma v. City of Redding
Plaintiff: |
Narendra Sharma |
Defendant: |
City of Redding |
Receiver: |
Richardson Griswold |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00487 |
Filed: |
March 6, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Solano |
Presiding Judge: |
Allison Claire |
Presiding Judge: |
Morrison C. England |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 21, 2019 |
Filing
66
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/18/19 DECLINING to relate or reassign cases. (Coll, A)
|
May 29, 2018 |
Filing
64
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/29/18, DENYING Defendant City of Redding's 58 Motion for Sanctions. (Kastilahn, A)
|
October 20, 2017 |
Filing
57
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/19/2017 ORDERING that All dates pending before the undersigned are VACATED; the Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. 48 ) should now be re-noticed by the moving party for hearing before the District Judge assigned to this action; Going forward, the parties shall conduct pretrial matters, other than discovery motions, before the District Judge assigned to this action. Discovery motions remain referred to the magistrate judge by Local Rule 302(c)(1); this matter is REFERRED back to the District Judge assigned to this action. (Becknal, R)
|
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
44
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/13/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file Oppositions or Statements of Non-Opposition to the pending 35 and 36 motions within 7 days; defendant's reply brief, if any, shall be filed no later than 7 days thereafter; the 07/26/17 hearing is VACATED; defendant's 35 Motion to Dismiss and 36 and Motion to Strike will be submitted upon the record and briefs without oral argument. (Benson, A)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
43
AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/11/2017 ORDERING 38 Order and Findings and Recommendations are WITHDRAWN; Objections 39 , 40 , 42 filed in response to the withdrawn Findings and Recommendation s, are deemed objections to the instant Findings andRecommendations; DENYING the defendant's Request for an Order to Show Cause re Sanctions without prejudice; RECOMMENDING that the 28 Motion to Set Aside State Court's Order Appointing Receiver as Void Order be denied. (Washington, S)
|
June 16, 2017 |
Filing
38
ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/16/2017 DENYING the defendant's Request for an Order to Show Cause re Sanctions without prejudice; RECOMMENDING that the 28 Motion to Set Aside State Courts Order Appointing Receiver as Void Order be denied; REFERRING this matter to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that any objections be filed and served within fourteen (14) days. (Michel, G.)
|
May 30, 2017 |
Filing
30
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/26/2017 ORDERING that defendant's 24 Motion to Dismiss is VACATED. Defendant's 25 Motion to Strike is VACATED. The court's 6/7/2017 hearing is VACATED. Plaintiff's 29 Motion to Continue the Hearing is DENIED. Defendant is directed to file a responsive pleading or 12(b) motion within twenty-one (21) days of this order. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 8, 2017 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/8/2017 ORDERING that the Court DENIES Plaintiff's 2 Motion to the extent it requests that the Court issue a TRO. A hearing on Plaintiff's alternative request f or a PI is, however, set for 4/6/2017, at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff is directed to provide notice of that hearing date to Defendants not later than 3/10/2017. Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's Motion must be filed not later than 3/24/2017, and a reply, if any, is due on 3/31/2017. (Zignago, K.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?