Shelton et al v. Progressus Therapy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Terri Shelton and Laura Thompson
Defendant: Progressus Therapy, LLC, Progressus Therapy, Inc., Progressus, Inc., Invo Healthcare Associates, LLC, Invo Healthcare, LLC and Therapy Station Associates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00518
Filed: March 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/6/2018 GRANTING 19 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Washington, S)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/15/2018 GRANTING 16 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action and PAGA Settlement. The Court ORDERS that Class Counsel shall file a motion for Final Approval of the Settlement, with the a ppropriate declarations and supporting evidence, including a declaration setting forth the identity of any Settlement Class Members who request exclusion from the Settlement or made any objections to it, by 6/6/2018. Final Approval Hearing set for 8/23/2018, at 02:00 PM, in Courtroom 2 (TLN), before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The Court further ORDERS that, pending further order of this Court, all proceedings in this Lawsuit, except those contemplated herein and in the Settlement, are STAYED. (See Order for further details.) (York, M)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/25/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to file a Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by 12/22/2017. Plaintiff shall set the Motion for hearing on regular notice. (Washington, S)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/12/2017 ORDERING a stay of all proceedings and VACATES all dates set forth in the 7 Pretrial Scheduling Order. The Parties are ordered to mediate by 11/15/2017. The Parties shall file a Post-Mediation Status Report no later than 11/27/2017 to advise the Court of the result of the mediation. The stay of this case shall continue until such time as expressly lifted by the Court. Case stayed (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton et al v. Progressus Therapy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressus Therapy, LLC
Represented By: Jason S. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressus Therapy, Inc.
Represented By: Jason S. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressus, Inc.
Represented By: Jason S. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invo Healthcare Associates, LLC
Represented By: Jason S. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invo Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Jason S. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Therapy Station Associates, LLC
Represented By: Jason S. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Shelton
Represented By: Nicholas P. Forestiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Thompson
Represented By: Nicholas P. Forestiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?