California River Watch v. City of Vacaville
Plaintiff: California River Watch
Defendant: City of Vacaville
Case Number: 2:2017cv00524
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/30/2020 ORDERING that Vacaville will bear its own costs. This order resolves ECF No. 84 . (Kastilahn, A)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/7/2020 WITHDRAWING 81 Bill of Costs. And EXTENDING the deadline for Defendant City of Vacaville to submit a bill of costs up to and including 8/18/2020. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/19/2020 ORDERING based on the foregoing discussion, defendant's motion for summary judgment, ECF No. 51 , is GRANTED and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, ECF No. 40 , is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to exclude, ECF No. 50 , and motion to strike, ECF No. 60 , as well as defendant's motion to strike, ECF No. 57 , all are DENIED as moot. The Clerk directed to enter judgment in defendant's favor and close this case.CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/7/2020 PARTIALLY DISMISSING CLAIMS. (York, M)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/11/2018 ORDERING the following deadlines EXTENDED: Last day to file Dispositive Motions is EXTENDED to 1/11/2019; Deadline to file oppositions to dispositive motions is EXTENDED to 2/1/2019; Deadline to file replies to oppositions is EXTENDED to 2/15/2019; All dispositive motions hearing date is EXTENDED to 3/8/2019. ORDERING the page limits are increased as follows: Memoranda of Points and Authorities ISO of Motion to 30 pages; Memoranda of Points and Authorities ISO of Opposition to 30 pages; Replies to 15 pages. (Washington, S)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FIRST AMENDMENT TO THE SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/8/2018 ORDERING dates MODIFIED as follows: Discovery Cutoff 9/3/2018; Expert Disclosures 10/5/2018; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures 10/26/2018; Completion of Expert Discovery 11/26/2018; All Dispositive Motions Hearing Date 1/11/2019; File Joint Pretrial Conference Statement VACATED; Final Pretrial Conference VACATED; Trial Briefs Due VACATED. Bench Trial VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/02/17 ORDERING that The City's time to file an Answer to the Complaint and to provide discovery responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production are both EXTENDED to 10/02/17. (Benson, A.)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/30/17 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION to DISMISS 5 is DENIED. Defendant shall file an answer within fourteen (14) days of the filed date of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/12/17, ORDERING that any supplemental claim under the California Safe Drinking Water and Toxic Enforcement Act of 1986 shall be filed within 14 days of this Orde r. Initial disclosures shall be completed within 45 days of the scheduling conference. All discovery shall be completed by 8/6/2018. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/7/2018, and rebuttal disclosures due by 9/28/2018. All expert discove ry shall be completed by 10/29/2018. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 12/7/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 4/19/2019 a t 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; the parties shall file a joint pretrial conference statement by 3/29/2019. The Bench Trial is SET for 6/17/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Trial briefs are due by 6/3/2019. (Kastilahn, A)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/6/17 ORDERING that the last date for the Parties to submit Initial Disclosures pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) is CONTINUED until 45 days after service of notice of the Court's ruling on the City's Motion to Dismiss. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California River Watch v. City of Vacaville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California River Watch
Represented By: Jack Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vacaville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?