Robben v. Dagostini
Petitioner: Todd Robben
Respondent: John Dagostini
Case Number: 2:2017cv00532
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/28/2018 DENYING as moot 5 ex-parte motion for a hearing; DENYING as moot 7 motion to expedite the decision; DENYING 9 motion for a court order requesting the facility to provide inmate debt fund and other miscellaneous relief; DENYING as moot 10 motion to expedite the petition; and DENYING as moot 21 motion for an extension of time to file a response to the motion to dismiss. It is RECOMMENDED that the 1 Petition be dismissed for lack of exhaustion. Referred to Senior District Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations.(York, M)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 03/14/18 ORDERING that respondent file, within 7 days, the petition to the California Supreme Court. (Plummer, M) Modified on 3/15/2018 (Plummer, M).
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/11/2017 ORDERING petitioner's surreply will be considered when this court issues its findings and recommendations on the pending 15 motion to dismiss. Petitioner shall file no further do cuments, motions, or notices in this court until the pending motion to dismiss has been resolved through an order of the court. The Clerk shall refrain from filing any such pre-resolution documents, if such are filed in violation of this order, and shall only note them on the court's docket as having been received. (Yin, K)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/30/17 denying 30 Motion for bail. (Plummer, M)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/24/2017 GRANTING 31 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due 8/28/2017. (Henshaw, R)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/10/2017 GRANTING petitioner's motion for ifp status. The El Dorado County District Attorney's Office shall have 10 days to file a reply memorandum if it chooses.(Yin, K)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/7/2017 ORDERING petitioner shall either oppose respondent's motion to dismiss within 45 days, or he may seek a stay of proceedings in this court and raise the issue before the state court pursuant to the Supreme Court's decision in Rhines v. Weber, 544 U.S. 269, 270 (2005). Petitioner's 16 request for counsel is DENIED. Petitioner's 17 request for discovery is DENIED. The court's 7/12/2017 order (ECF No. 12 ), directing the AG to respond to the petition is WITHDRAWN. The motion to dismiss by the District Attorney of El Dorado County is ADOPTED as the response to the petition. (Yin, K)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/15/2017 ORDERING Petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit to support his request to proceed IFP or the filing fee. Clerk of Court to serve copy of habeas petition and two motions filed upon District Attorney of El Dorado County, Vern Pierson who shall file a response, either a Motion to Dismiss or an Answer, within 30 days after the service of this Order, or by 7/17/2017. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robben v. Dagostini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Todd Robben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Dagostini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?