Fratus v. Klein et al

Plaintiff: John Fratus
Defendant: T. Klein, M. Ramirez, K. Huggett and J. Nicholson
Case Number: 2:2017cv00535
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/21/2017 ORDERING the Custodian to produce John Fratus at 9:00 a.m. on 11/9/2017 in Courtroom #4 before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison and OTCD) (Henshaw, R)
August 3, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to sch edule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/3/2017. (Henshaw, R)
July 13, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/13/17 denying 16 Motion for the U.S. Marshal service and granting 20 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to effect service on defendants. (Plummer, M)
June 13, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/13/2017 DENYING as duplicative 17 and 18 Motions for U.S. Marshal to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff to complete and return the application to proceed IFP within 30 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
April 18, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/18/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 6 motion for disqualification. (Yin, K)
March 24, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/24/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fratus v. Klein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fratus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Huggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?