Nadeau et al v. Wealth Counsel LLC et al
Plaintiff: Laurie Nadeau, Robyn Coffin and Dagny Magelssen
Defendant: Wealth Counsel LLC and Insperity, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00561
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/20/2018 CONTINUING discovery completion date to 5/15/2019. (Zignago, K.)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/13/2018 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 34 Motion to Compel as follows: (1) Defendants' assertion of attorney-client privilege is sustained as to the documents identified in the Am ended Privilege Log as Nos. 44, 72, and 73, and is otherwise overruled; (2) The motion to compel is DENIED as to the documents identified in the Amended Privilege Log as Nos. 44, 72, and 73, and is otherwise GRANTED; (3) Defendants must produce, within 30 days of entry of this order, all documents responsive to RFP Nos. 2-7 and RFP No. 22, except those identified here as privileged. (York, M)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/1/18. (Kastilahn, A)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/3/2018 DENYING 21 Motion to Change Venue. (Zignago, K.)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/28/2017 ORDERING that: The stay should be lifted as of 11/15/2017; Plaintiffs will file their Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer (ECF No. 21) by 12/1/2017; Defendants will file the ir Answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint within 15 days after service of the First Amended Complaint; The Parties will be deemed to have conferred with respect to discovery on 11/15/2017; The Parties will exchange their initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a) on 12/11/2017. (Hunt, G)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/12/2017 GRANTING the parties joint request for a temporary stay of all proceedings, including discovery and motion practice; Defendants' 9 Motion to Stay is DENIED at MOOT; the parties will file a Joint Statement with the Court on the status of the case following mediation by 11/15/2017. CASE STAYED(Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nadeau et al v. Wealth Counsel LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Nadeau
Represented By: Joseph E. Maloney
Represented By: Alan Jay Reinach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Coffin
Represented By: Joseph E. Maloney
Represented By: Alan Jay Reinach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dagny Magelssen
Represented By: Joseph E. Maloney
Represented By: Alan Jay Reinach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wealth Counsel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insperity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?