Mejia v. Farmland Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: |
Scarlette Mejia |
Defendant: |
Farmland Mutual Insurance Company and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00570 |
Filed: |
March 16, 2017 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Presiding Judge: |
Troy L. Nunley |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 13, 2018 |
Filing
27
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/10/2018 ORDERING That the PAGA claims alleged in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice; That the claims of any putative class member, class claims, and/or class allegations shall be DISMISSED without prejudice; That Plaintiff's individual claims shall be DISMISSED with prejudice; and All parties shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
|
July 17, 2018 |
Filing
25
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/16/2018 ORDERING that the Parties shall meet and confer and submit new proposed deadlines for discovery, expert witness disclosures, and certification motion filing within 30 days after Defendants file an Answer. The Court's 6 Pretrial Scheduling Order shall remain in effect in all other respects. (Zignago, K.)
|
June 26, 2018 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/25/2018 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss for the reasons set forth in this order. Plaintiff is afforded 30 days to file her Second Amended Complaint. (Fabillaran, J)
|
August 17, 2017 |
Filing
22
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/17/17: The November 30, 2017 discovery deadline, the December 28, 2017 expert witness disclosure deadline, and the February 22, 2018 filing deadline for a motion for class certif ication is vacated. If the Court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss and strike class allegations, the Parties shall meet and confer and submit new proposed deadlines for discovery, expert witness disclosures, and certification motion filing within 14 days thereafter for the Court's consideration. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 8/17/2017 (Kaminski, H).
|
May 30, 2017 |
Filing
8
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/25/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's First, Second, and Third Causes of Action are DISMISSED, without prejudice, and with each side to bear their own fees and costs as to those clai ms. Plaintiff's request for leave to file her First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is deemed filed and served on Defendants, on the date of this Order. Defendants shall have 30 days from the date of entry of the Order hereon by the Court to file a responsive pleading. (Kastilahn, A)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?