Johnson v. Patel et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Hasmukhbai Patel and Damyantiban Patel
Case Number: 2:2017cv00573
Filed: March 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/22/2020 DENYING plaintiff's request that a bench warrant be issued for defendant. (Zignago, K.)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/27/19 ORDERING that Defendants are sanctioned $250, for the cost of Plaintiff's counsel's court appearance, to be paid to Plaintiff's counsel within twenty-one (21) days of this order. The Judgment-Debtor Examination and Show Cause Hearing is RESCHEDULED for 1/8/2020. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/1/19 GRANTING 35 Plaintiff's motion to continue, on the terms of this order. Damyantiban Patel SHALL personally appear at the Show Cause Hearing on 7/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The Judgment Debtor Exam is CONTINUED to 7/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney where Damyantiban Patel shall personally appear. Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this order on Damyantiban Patel. Damyantiban Patel is hereby CAUTIONED that failure to appear at the hearings listed above may result in a finding of contempt, the issuance of a bench warrant for his arrest, and/or the imposition of any other appropriate sanctions. (Kastilahn, A)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/4/2019 ORDERING Damyantiban Patel shall personally appear before Judge Delaney on 4/3/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 24 to SHOW CAUSE why he should not be held in contempt or have other appropriate sanctions imposed against him for failure to appear at the 10/24/2018 judgment debtor examination and the 1/2/2019 show cause hearing. A continued judgment debtor examination is set for 4/3/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 24 before Judge Delaney. Damyantiban Patel shall personally appear for that judgment debtor examination. (Zignago, K.)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/8/18 ORDERING that 28 Plaintiff's proposed certification of fact of contempt is GRANTED IN PART. Damyantiban Patel shall personally appear before Judge Delaney on January 2, 2019 a t 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 24 to SHOW CAUSE why he should not be held in contempt or have other appropriate sanctions imposed against him for failure to appear at the October 24, 2018 judgment debtor examination. A continued Judgment Debtor Exam is set for 1/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Kaminski, H)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/13/2018 ORDERING the Judgment Debtor Exam CONTINUED to 10/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Donati, J)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION re Enforcement of Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/14/2018; Damyantiban Patel is hereby ORDERED to appear before the Honorable Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/15/2018 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD). (Fabillaran, J)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/8/2017 RECOMMENDING that the 11 Motion for Default Judgment be granted in part, that judgment be entered in favor of the plaintiff and against Defendants Hasm ukhbai Patel and Damyantiban Patel, that the plaintiff be awarded $4,000.00 in statutory damages and $3,560.00 in attorneys' fees and costs, that the plaintiff be granted an injunction requiring the defendants to provide readily achiev able property alterations, and that the Clerk of Court be directed to vacate all dates and close this case; ORDERING the plaintiff the forthwith serve copies of this order and findings and recommendations on the defendants by U.S. mail at their last-known address; REFERRING this matter to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING that any objections be filed and served within fourteen (14) days. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Russell Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasmukhbai Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damyantiban Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?