Chavez v. Sullivan

Petitioner: Enrique Chavez
Respondent: J. Sullivan
Case Number: 2:2017cv00575
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yuba
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/23/2017 RECOMMENDING that the 1 Petition should be dismissed with prejudice, no Certificate of Appealability should issue and the Clerk of the Court shall close this file. Objections due within 20 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Hunt, G)
September 25, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/22/2017 ORDERING petitioner to show cause, within 15 days, why his failure to file his opposition as ordered should not be deemed a waiver of any opposition to the granting of the motion, or he shall file an opposition. Petitioner is cautioned that failure to respond timely to this Order to Show cause will lead to a recommendation that his petition shall be dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall randomly assign this matter to a district court judge. Assigned to US District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. and US Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows; the new case number is 2:17-cv-0575 GEB GGH (HC). (Yin, K)
July 20, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/17/2017 GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner to file opposition to 10 Motion to Dismiss by 8/29/2017. (Henshaw, R)
March 24, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/24/2017 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)
March 17, 2017 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/17/2017. New Case Number 2:17-cv-00575-GGH (HC). Old Case Number 1:17-cv-00362-MJS (HC). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Enrique Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?