Hudson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gerald William Hudson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00589
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 5/7/2019 GRANTING plaintiff's 25 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $6,098.37 in fees plus $19.86 in costs, for a total of $6,118.24, payable to plaintiff. (Zignago, K.)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/20/2018 GRANTING plaintiff's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING the Commissioner's 15 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Commissioner's final decision is REVERSED and this matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/26/2018 DISCHARGING 17 Order to Show Cause. (Washington, S)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/16/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff shall show cause in writing, within 30 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to inform the court regarding consent to Ma gistrate Judge jurisdiction, as required by the court's scheduling order. Submission of a completed consent election form shall constitute a sufficient response. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve on plaintiff a copy of the court's form entitled "Consent to Assignment or Request for Reassignment." (cc: Consent 7 to Plaintiff)(Reader, L)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/12/2017 GRANTING Defendant's Extension of Time to 11/27/2017 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Hunt, G)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/14/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; the Clerk is directed to serve on plaintiff the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases; Within 15 days Plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted. (cc: USM). (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald William Hudson
Represented By: Stuart T. Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Carolyn B. Chen, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?