Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC v. Nordstrom et al
Plaintiff: Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC
Defendant: John Nordstrom and Innovation Wealth Management
Case Number: 2:2017cv00594
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/22/17 ORDERING Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (a)(1)(A)(ii) and (a)(2), the complaint filed in the captioned action by Fidelity against Defendants is DISMISSED with prejudice; No a ward of attorneys' fees or costs, or of expert fees or costs, is or shall be made in favor of any party; and the Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement entered into between Fidelity and Defendants, and to resolve any disputes relating to, or arising under, the Settlement Agreement. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/5/2017 ORDERING the defendants to respond to the 1 Complaint within 30 days after a final decision is entered by the FINRA Arbitration Panel. (Michel, G.)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/30/2017 GRANTING 5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Donati, J)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/23/2017. (Zignago, K.)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/22/2017 DENYING Ex Parte Request to Seal Documents re 7 Notice of Request to Seal Documents. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC v. Nordstrom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC
Represented By: Nina Huerta
Represented By: Jennifer Kenedy, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nordstrom
Represented By: Valerie Elise Collanton
Represented By: Dylan W. Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovation Wealth Management
Represented By: Valerie Elise Collanton
Represented By: Dylan W. Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?