Varfolomeeva v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Alina Varfolomeeva
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv00599
Filed: March 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/4/18 ORDERING that the Settlement Conference scheduled before the Honorable Allison Claire on 6/14/18, be vacated. The parties have reached a settlement in principle and are working to finalize a written settlement agreement and dismiss this matter with prejudice. Accordingly, the parties believe that the Settlement Conference is no longer necessary. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/9/2018 APPROVING 31 Stipulation. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for 6/14/2018, at 09:00 AM, in Courtroom 26 (AC), before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (cc: AC) (York, M)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/13/18: Within seven days of this order, defendant shall retrieve the September 23, 2014 Application for Disabled Person Placard or Plates from the undersigned's courtroom deputy, and shall provide plaintiff with a copy.(Kaminski, H)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/22/18, ORDERING that Defendant's 24 motion to compel plaintiff to execute release for medical information in DMV records is GRANTED IN PART. On or before 3/26/2018, plaintiff shall complete a consent and waiver for release of medical information in DMV records. A copy of the Application for Disabled Person Placard or Plates shall be provided to the court on or before 4/9/2018, for an in camera review. (Kastilahn, A)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/28/2018 as to 24 Motion to Compel; Motion Hearing RESET for 3/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney.(Fabillaran, J)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/6/2017 DIRECTING plaintiff to submit to a Rule 35 mental examination by defendant's suitably licensed expert. (York, M)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER re Rule 35 Physical Examination signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/31/17. (Kaminski, H)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/30/17 ADOPTING the 3 Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order, 7 Stipulation and Order; DEEMING said orders effective for the proceedings currently before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Becknal, R)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/1/2017 REASSIGNING CASE to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings. The parties shall take note that all documents hereafter filed with the Clerk of the Court shall bear case number 2:17-CV-599 CKD. All currently scheduled dates presently set before Judge England are hereby VACATED; District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. no longer assigned to case. (Reader, L)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/24/2017 MODIFYING the Pretrial Scheduling Order; ORDERING all parties to serve initial disclosures by 6/26/2017; ORDERING that fact discovery be completed by 12/18/2017; ORD ERING the plaintiff to disclose expert witnesses by 1/29/2018; ORDERING the defendant to disclose expert witnesses by 3/26/2018; ORDERING all parties to disclose supplemental experts by 5/28/2018; ORDERING that expert discovery be completed by 7/30/2018; ORDERING that all dispositive motions be filed by 9/17/2018. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varfolomeeva v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alina Varfolomeeva
Represented By: Kirill Tarasenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?