Rodriguez v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Rodriguez
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Scott Jones and Erik Maness
Case Number: 2:2017cv00611
Filed: March 21, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/19/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/16/2018 DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to randomly assign a U.S. District Judge to this case. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. assigned to this case. (Fabillaran, J)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/18/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 30 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to submit the required service documents. (Yin, K)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/24/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Raymond Rodriguez. Plaintiff to pay full statutory filing fee of $350. All payments to be collected in accordance with this order. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/23/2017. New Case Number 2:17-cv-00611-CMK (PC). Old Case Number 1:17-cv-00412-SKO (PC). (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Maness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?