Galvez v. Anheuser-Busch, LLC
Plaintiff: Azul Galvez
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00621
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/22/2018 ORDERING that Plaintiff Azul Galvezs lawsuit against Defendant Anheuser-Busch, LLC is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) (i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hunt, G)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/11/2017 for Senior Judge William B. Shubb granting 32 Plaintiff Azul Galvez's Request for Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Erica Flores Baltodano for Azul Galvez added. Attorney Hernaldo Jose Baltodano terminated. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER extending time for defendants to respond to the first amended complaint by 60 days, signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/22/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER 28 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/20/2017 continuing the Scheduling Conference to 2/26/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 2/12/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/19/2017 GRANTING Defendant's Extension of Time of 30 days to respond to the First Amended Complaint.(Hunt, G)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/19/2017 GRANTING 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The court does not reach defendant's alternative motions to compel arbitration or to stay these proceedings. Plaintiff is given 20 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint consistent with this order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvez v. Anheuser-Busch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azul Galvez
Represented By: Hernaldo Jose Baltodano
Represented By: Paul K. Haines
Represented By: Matthew Kevin Moen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?