Weller v. Healthnow New York, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dave Weller
Defendant: Healthnow New York, Inc., Healthnow, Brokerage Concepts, Inc., Healthnow Systems, Inc. and Healthnow Administrative Services
Case Number: 2:2017cv00623
Filed: March 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/8/2018 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(l)(A)(ii); each party shall bear his/its own costs and attorneys' fees. CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/5/2017 ORDERING that the First Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit A, is deemed filed and served on Defendants Brokerage Concepts, Inc., HealthNow New York Inc., HealthNow Admini strative Services (a DBA of Brokerage Concepts, Inc.), and HealthNow Systems, Inc. as of the date of this Order. Defendants HealthNow New York Inc., HealthNow Administrative Services (a DBA of Brokerage Concepts, Inc.), and HealthNow Systems, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED from this lawsuit without prejudice and any claims by Plaintiff not already barred against these defendants are tolled during the pendency of this lawsuit. Defendant HealthNow, Inc. is hereby DISMISSED from this lawsuit without prejudice. Brokerage Concepts, Inc. shall file a response to the First Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. (Zignago, K.)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/12/2017 ORDERING that HealthNow New York Inc. respond to the initial complaint by 5/30/2017. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weller v. Healthnow New York, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Weller
Represented By: Lawrance A. Bohm
Represented By: Robert L. Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthnow New York, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle L. DuCharme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brokerage Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle L. DuCharme
Represented By: Kurt A. Kappes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthnow Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthnow Administrative Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?