Perez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Benjamin Enriquez Perez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00624
Filed: March 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/16/18, ORDERING that Plaintiff's 19 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's 22 cross-motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is entered for the Commissioner. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/26/2017 ORDERING the deadline for defendant to file MSJ is EXTENDED to 10/25/2017. (Washington, S)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/24/17. (Kaminski, H)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/29/17 ORDERING that the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Enriquez Perez
Represented By: Shellie Lott
Represented By: Linda Susan Ziskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?