Reysner v. Navient Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Piotr Reysner
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc., Navient, Inc., Nellie Mae Corporation and Nellie Mae A Sallie Mae Student Loan Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00641
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/7/18 Recommending that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 41 be granted in full. Plaintiff's request for further leave to amend the complaint be DENIED . Judgment be entered for defendant. The Clerk of Court be directed to close this case. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen (14) days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/15/2018 DENYING 35 Motion for Leave to Amend for the reasons set forth in this order. (Fabillaran, J)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/14/17. (Kastilahn, A)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/17/17: Plaintiff's request 9 is GRANTED and the substitution of counsel is APPROVED. Attorney Scott Douglas Shumaker for Piotr Reysner added. All dates presently scheduled before Judge Newman, including the August 3, 2017 initial scheduling conference, are VACATED. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reysner v. Navient Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Adrian L. Canzoneri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nellie Mae Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nellie Mae A Sallie Mae Student Loan Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piotr Reysner
Represented By: Scott Douglas Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?