Williams Sports Rentals Inc.
Petitioner: Williams Sports Rentals Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00653
Filed: March 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/27/2020 GRANTING 90 Motion to lift the anti-suit injunction and stay further proceedings in admiralty. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/23/2020 CONTINUING the hearing on 90 Counter Claimant Willis' motion to 6/16/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. WSR's response is due no later than 6/5/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/25/2020 CONTINUING hearing re 90 Motion to Lift Anti-Suit Injunction; Stay to 5/19/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Zignago, K.)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/1/2019 to 86 USCA Order re Invitation to Comment on Claimant Marian Willis' Petition for a Writ of Mandamus. (CC: USCA, USCA No. 19-72233) (Huang, H)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/30/2019 GRANTING 72 Amended Motion for Judgment and Exoneration. (Michel, G.)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/15/17 GRANTING S WSR's 57 Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE. (Becknal, R)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/31/2017; DENYING 47 Motion to Stay and 50 Motion to Stay. (Hunt, G)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/11/17, ORDERING that the deadline for submission of the joint status report is set to 9/27/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/29/2017 APPROVING stipulation of value and letter of undertaking, directing claimants to file and make proof of claims, directing the issuance of monition, and restraining prosecution of claims. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams Sports Rentals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Williams Sports Rentals Inc.
Represented By: Brian Otis Felder
Represented By: Ian A. Stewart
Represented By: Eric S. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?