Schmuckley v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Loyd F. Schmuckley, Jr.
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Intervenor_plaintiff: State of California and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv00673
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/17/2017 DISCHARGING 60 Order to Show Cause. ORDERING the balance of the docket remain under seal pending further developments in the Wisconsin district court action. ORDERING Plaintiffs to provide a status report on the Wisconsin court's proceedings within 90 days of the date of this order, and every 90 days thereafter until relieved of the obligation by this court. (Washington, S)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/15/17 ORDERING that the court tentatively finds it unnecessary for any part of the case to remain sealed. Within 14 days of this order, any party may SHOW CAUSE, if any there is, as to why the balance of the documents of record in this action should not be unsealed. (Kastilahn, A)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/2/17 ORDERING that All claims asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice as to Relator, provided that the Court shall retain jurisdiction to make an award to the Relator and/or his counsel of reasonable attorneyS' fees, expenses and costs resulting from this action pursuant to 31 U.S.C. § 3730(d) and Cal. Govt Code§ 12652(g). All claims asserted in this action for the Covered Conduct as that term is defined in the Settlement Agreement between the United States, California, Relator, and defendant Walgreen Co. are DISMISSED with prejudice as to the United States and California. All other claims asserted in this action are DISMISSED without prejudice as to the United States, California, and any other named governmental plaintiff. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/19/2017 ORDERING the 53 Amended Complaint, 49 Notice of Partial Intervention, Settlement and Consent for Dismissal and this order are UNSEALED. All other previously filed content REMAINS SEALED. It is further ORDERED that the seal shall be LIFTED on all matters occurring in this action after the date of this order. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmuckley v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Emmanuel Ramon Salazar
Represented By: Bernice Ling Louie Yew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Catherine J. Swann(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loyd F. Schmuckley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. Armitage
Represented By: Loren Jacobson, PHV
Represented By: Wm. Paul Lawrence, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?