Martinez et al v. Eastern Plumas Health Care Foundation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maria Martinez, Lisa Taylor, Michelle Perez and Barbara Nieminen
Defendant: Eastern Plumas Health Care Foundation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00674
Filed: March 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/28/17, ORDERING that plaintiffs are GRANTED an additional two weeks, to 7/14/2017, to file a second amended complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER to extend time to respond to the summons and first Amended Complaint signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/12/17. Plaintiffs agree to file a second amended complaint by 6/30/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/3/17: The deadline to respond to the Complaint is CONTINUED to May 22, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Eastern Plumas Health Care Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Martinez
Represented By: Ryan Lee Hicks
Represented By: Richard Anderson Hoyer
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Taylor
Represented By: Ryan Lee Hicks
Represented By: Richard Anderson Hoyer
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Perez
Represented By: Ryan Lee Hicks
Represented By: Richard Anderson Hoyer
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Nieminen
Represented By: Ryan Lee Hicks
Represented By: Richard Anderson Hoyer
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Plumas Health Care Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?