Harris v. Fernan et al

Plaintiff: Wayde Hollis Harris
Defendant: S. Fernan, E. Arnold, T. Wamble, J. Guillory, L. Austin, M. Kuersten, D. Toche, V. Estrella, C. Davis and Special Appearance
Case Number: 2:2017cv00680
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/10/19 DENYING 63 Motion to Compel. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/26/2019 CONSTRUING 68 Objections as Request for Reconsideration; GRANTING 68 Request for Reconsideration; and, upon reconsideration, DENYING Request for Further Production to request number 14. (Henshaw, R)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/1/2019 GRANTING IN PART 59 Motion to Compel. See order for details. (Henshaw, R)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/29/2019 GRANTING 62 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline; ORDERING discovery extended solely for the purpose of resolving 63 Motion to Compel; GRANTING Defendant 30 days to file an opposition to 63 Motion to Compel and Plaintiff to file a reply 14 days thereafter; and VACATING 52 Pretrial Motions Deadline and will be reset following resolution of 63 Motion to Compel. No party shall file a dispositive motion until after the court sets the new pretrial motions deadline. (Henshaw, R)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/18/2019 DENYING plaintiff's 53 motion for the court to pay fees. (Yin, K)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/16/2018 ORDERING the custodian to produce Wayde Hollis Harris G-36394, to testify in USDC at 9:00 a.m. on 9/25/2018 in courtroom #25, before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and Warden. (cc: OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/11/2018 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 44 request. (Yin, K)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/9/2018 GRANTING 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel; APPOINTING Michael E. Vinding as limited purpose counsel of assisting plaintiff with preparing for and participating in a settlement conference; DENYING 39 Motion to Expedite ADR Hearing; VACATING 6/5/2018 settlement conference; and VACATING 41 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum. Michael E. Vinding's appointment will terminate 15 days after completion of the settlement confere nce or any continuation of the settlement conference. Within 2 weeks from the date of this order, both parties' counsel to contact Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman's courtroom deputy to select a new settlement conference date. (cc: Out-To-Court Desk) (Henshaw, R) Modified on 5/10/2018 (Henshaw, R).
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/01/18 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Wayde Hollis Harris on 6/05/18 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Plummer, M)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/12/18 REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigne d DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Christopher Becker. (cc: Christopher Becker) (Plummer, M)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/12/18 ADOPTING 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Defendant J. Clark Kelso is dismissed from this action. (Kaminski, H)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/10/2018 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 23 , 25 motions for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/20/2017 ORDERING claims against defendants Arnold, Voong, Dr. Largoza, Dr. Chen Yuen, Guillory, and Wamble, are DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days. Pla intiff is not obligated to amend the complaint. The allegations are sufficient to state potentially cognizable claims against defendant Dr. Kuersten. The Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service to be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's claims against defendant Clark be dismissed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 9/19/17, ADOPTING in FULL 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's 3 , 13 motions for injunctive relief are DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Wayde Hollis Harris signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/6/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/29/2017 ORDERING the Clerk to assign a district judge to the case. District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. was randomly added to this case. The case number on all future filed documents shall be: 2:17-cv-0680 GEB KJN (PC). It is hereby RECOMMENDED that 3 & 13 Motions for Injunctive Relief be denied. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. (Donati, J)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/11/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to file reply to the 4/12/2017 response. (Henshaw, R)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/5/2017 ORDERING the Clerk to serve this order and plaintiff's 3 motion for injuctive relief on Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson. Monica Anderson shall file the status report discussed herein within 7 days. (cc: Monica Anderson)(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Fernan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayde Hollis Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Fernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Wamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Kuersten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Toche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Appearance
Represented By: Kelli Marie Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?