Barraza v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Bryant Barraza
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2017cv00682
Filed: March 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/11/19 RECOMMENDING that defendant's motion for summary judgment 22 be granted and the clerk of court be directed to close this case. Motion for Summary Judgment 22 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/26/2019 DENYING 25 Motion to Stay Consideration of Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion; DENYING 26 Motion to File for Late Discovery; and GRANTING Plaintiff, sua sponte, an extension of time. Plaintiff to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to 22 Motion for Summary Judgment within 30 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Bryant Barraza signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/06/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/5/2017 DISMISSING without prejudice plaintiff's 2 request to proceed IFP; plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a signed and completed affidavit to proceed ifp; the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application; and plaintiff shall submit within 30 days, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement. (Yin, K)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/30/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barraza v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Barraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?