Maxwell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jeanette Eileen Maxwell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00705
Filed: April 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/14/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 20 is DENIED; Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment CASE 23 is GRANTED; The decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is AFFIRMED; and The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for defendant and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/22/2018 DIRECTING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 14 days of the date of this order for failing to file a timely motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff may comply with this order by filing a motion for summary judgment. (York, M)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 04/17/17 ORDERING that the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and within 5 days thereafter, plaintiff shall file a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Eileen Maxwell
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?