Gamestop Inc. v. Bridgett, et al.,
Plaintiff: Gamestop Inc.
Defendant: Stephanie A. Bridgett and Michael Hestrin
Case Number: 2:2017cv00719
Filed: April 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/1/2017 ORDERING 35 The Court is aware of its obligation to first determine jurisdiction before ruling on any substantive motions. The Court's efforts to prevent prolonging the case does not me an the Court will ignore this important fact. The parties need not remind the Court of this fact through continued filings. Defendants' 35 Motion for Relief or Clarity from this Court's previous order is hereby DENIED as MOOT. (Reader, L)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 05/23/17 ORDERING that the Motions for Continuance are DENIED; discovery is STAYED pending the resolution of the parties' 9 24 Motions. (Benson, A)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/11/2017 ORDERING that Hopp's motion for permission for electronic case filing (ECF No. 23 ) is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/9/2017 ORDERING the foregoing reasons, this Court finds that injunctive relief is not appropriate with the information before the Court at this point in the litigation. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 11 ) is hereby DENIED. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamestop Inc. v. Bridgett, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gamestop Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin P. Smith
Represented By: Sharon R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie A. Bridgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hestrin
Represented By: Timothy Steven Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?