June 10, 2024 |
Filing
199
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/10/2024 GRANTING 197 Request For Transcripts and AUTHORIZING The Clerk to pay the Court Reporters for the transcripts at the 14-day expedited rate. Court Reporters assigned to the 9/7/2023 and 2/15/2024 hearings shall provide transcripts to plaintiff and the court no later than 7/1/2021. (cc Court Services Supervisor, Marianne Valenoti, Abigail Torres)(Kyono, V)
|
February 6, 2024 |
Filing
175
ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 2/6/2024 DENYING 173 Motion to Compel. (Michel, G.)
|
January 26, 2024 |
Filing
171
ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 01/25/24 DENYING 145 Motion to Compel and GRANTING 162 Motion to Quash. (Benson, A.)
|
January 22, 2024 |
Filing
164
ORDER and WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 01/22/2024 DIRECTING the Warden of California Institution for Women to produce Lisa Marie Perez, #WG-0016, on 1/31/2024 at 9:00 AM via Zoom videoconference before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. (Spichka, K.)
|
January 4, 2024 |
Filing
152
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 01/04/2024 DIRECTING the Warden of California Institution for Women to produce Lisa Marie Perez, #WG-0016, on 2/20/2024 at 9:00 AM before the Honorable Daniel J. Calabretta, 13th Floor, Courtroom 10. (cc: OTC Desk) (Spichka, K.)
|
September 27, 2023 |
Filing
124
ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 9/26/2023 DENYING 112 Motion for Restraining Order, and DENYING 122 Request for Jury Instructions. (Reader, L)
|
September 13, 2023 |
Filing
118
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/13/2023 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Lisa Marie Belyew on 10/26/2023 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 10 before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Huang, H)
|
August 9, 2023 |
Filing
106
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/9/2023 ORDERING each party to serve copies of their exhibits on the other party no later than 10/31/2023. (Huang, H)
|
August 8, 2023 |
Filing
105
ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/8/2023 ORDERING the custodian to produce Lisa Marie Belyew WG-0016, by Zoom video conference from her place of confinement, before District Ju dge Daniel J. Calabretta, on 9/7/2023 at 1:30 p.m.; the custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and any difficulties connecting to the Zoom video conference shall immediately be reported to Courtroom Deputy Gabriel Michel.(Yin, K)
|
July 11, 2023 |
Filing
104
ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 7/10/2023 DENYING 101 Motion to Stay. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
April 11, 2023 |
Filing
97
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/11/2023 DENYING plaintiff's 95 motion asking that the court order the Colusa County Sheriff's Office to provide plaintiff with a copy of her booking photo. (Yin, K)
|
January 25, 2022 |
Filing
90
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/25/22 ORDERING the Custodian to produce by Zoom video conference Lisa Belyew on 2/22/22 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento and SAB)(Plummer, M)
|
January 20, 2022 |
Filing
89
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/19/2022 SETTING Video Settlement Conference set for 2/22/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Henshaw, R)
|
September 28, 2020 |
Filing
85
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/25/20 DENYING 84 Motion in Limine. (Plummer, M)
|
March 31, 2020 |
Filing
80
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/30/2020 ADOPTING in part 73 Findings and Recommendations. Defendant's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment excessive force claim concerning her allegation that Defendant grabbed her buttocks causing bruises and GRANTED in all other respects. This matter is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge assigned to this case for further proceedings. (Kastilahn, A)
|
March 17, 2020 |
Filing
79
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/17/20 DENYING 78 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
|
February 10, 2020 |
Filing
73
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/10/20 RECOMMENDING that defendant's motion for summary judgment 53 be denied as to plaintiff's Fourth Amendment excessive force claims concerning her allegati on that defendant grabbed her buttocks causing bruises and the duration of time plaintiff was forced to lie on her stomach with her feet and hands tied together; and defendant's motion for summary judgment be granted in all other respects. Motion for Summary Judgment 53 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
February 3, 2020 |
Filing
71
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/3/2020 DENYING defendant's 66 motion to strike; and the court sua sponte strikes documents filed by plaintiff on 6/20/2019 (ECF Nos. 67 , 68 ). (Yin, K)
|
May 13, 2019 |
Filing
57
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/13/2019 DENYING plaintiff's 56 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
|
November 8, 2018 |
Filing
48
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/08/18 GRANTING 43 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is ordered to provide testimony at a deposition within 30 days. Defendant shall provide plaintiff with notice of the deposition as required by Rule 30(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendant may videotape the deposition. Plaintiffs request for a protective order is DENIED. Plaintiffs request that the transcript of the deposition be sealed is DENIED. Plaintiff request that the court order that plaintiff be provided a copy of the deposition transcript free of charge is DENIED. (Plummer, M)
|
September 28, 2018 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/28/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 41 motion for a protective order. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall file a response to defendant's pending motion to compel. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Yin, K)
|
May 18, 2018 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/18/2018 DENYING 34 Motion for Pretrial Discovery. (Henshaw, R)
|
May 15, 2018 |
Filing
35
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/15/2018 ADOPTING in FULL 27 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 22 Motion for Default Judgment; The Colusa Police Department is DISMISSED. (Washington, S)
|
March 27, 2018 |
Filing
27
ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/27/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint and DISMISSING plaintiff's original complaint, and the Clerk shall assign a di strict judge to this case. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's 22 motion for default judgment be denied and the Colusa Police Department be dismissed. Assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
April 12, 2017 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/12/2017 ORDERING, within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit a certified copy of her jail trust account statement.(Yin, K)
|