US InterLoc Matting, Inc. v. Macro Plastics, Inc.
Plaintiff: US InterLoc Matting, Inc.
Defendant: Macro Plastics, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Macro Plastics, Inc.
Counter_defendant: US InterLoc Matting, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00733
Filed: March 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/15/2018 ORDERING all claims and counterclaims stated herein against all parties, are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, together with the entirety of the action. CASE CLOSED. (Fabillaran, J)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDERs igned by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/13/17 ORDERING that Defendant's 8/29/17 MOTION for Protective Order 13 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Nos. 1, 4, 5, 6, 10, 11, and 12 shall be subject to a 11/30/16 cut-off date; and All documents created after 11/17/16, shall be designated as "CONFIDENTIAL- ATTORNEYS EYES ONLY." (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/12/17, ORDERING that the 10/20/2017 hearing of defendant's 13 motion for a protective order is CONTINUED to 11/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. On or before 10/27/2017, the parties shall file a joint statement that complies with the Local Rules and the undersigned's Standard Information. (Kastilahn, A)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/22/17 ORDERING that Counterclaimant Macro Plastics, Inc. is GRANTED leave of court to file its First Amended Counterclaim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counter defendant U.S. Interloc Matting, Inc. shall file its Answer to the First Amended Counterclaim within 20 days after the First Amended Counterclaim is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the First Amended Counterclaim is deemed filed as of the date this Order is transmitted to the parties via the CM/ECF system. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/14/2017. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US InterLoc Matting, Inc. v. Macro Plastics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macro Plastics, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Knowlton
Represented By: Michael Scott Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US InterLoc Matting, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Diepenbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Macro Plastics, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Knowlton
Represented By: Michael Scott Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: US InterLoc Matting, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Diepenbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?