Cooper-Belanger v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Karen Agatha Cooper-Belanger
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00769
Filed: April 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/29/2018 DENYING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING 18 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Fabillaran, J)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER For Extension of time for Defendant to file her MSJ signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/9/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/27/17: Plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including December 5, 2017, in which to file Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendant may have an extension of time to January 4, 2018 to file his opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by plaintiff will be due January 25, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/22/17: Plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including November 10, 2017, in which to file Motion of Summary Judgment. Defendant may have an extension of time to December 11, 2017 to file his opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by plaintiff will be due January 2, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper-Belanger v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Agatha Cooper-Belanger
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?