Renteria v. Davey
Petitioner: Ronald Dave Renteria
Respondent: Dave Davey
Case Number: 2:2017cv00784
Filed: April 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/13/2017 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice to its renewal as a civil rights action. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/05/17 ORDERING petitioner's 10/02/17 objections to the court's September 20th order are denied. Within 20 days of the filed date of this order, petitioner may either file a civil rights complaint as described in the September 20 order or seek dismissal of this action. (Plummer, M)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/20/2017 DISMISSING the petition without prejudice. Petitioner may amend his pleading and present his due process claim in a civil rights complaint 42 U.S.C. § 1983, rather than a habeas petit ion, within 30 days. The Clerk shall send petitioner a blank civil rights complaint form along with this order. The court will reserve ruling on the motion to proceed ifp. If petitioner chooses not to amend, he should file notice of voluntary dismissal under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1). (Yin, K)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/17/2017 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, a complete affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renteria v. Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Dave Renteria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dave Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?