City of Los Angeles, et al. v. Sprint Solutions, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Richard Knudsen
Defendant: Sprint Solutions, Inc. and Nextel of California, Inc.
Intervenor_plaintiff: City of Los Angeles
Case Number: 2:2017cv00811
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/13/19 GRANTING Sprint until 30 days after the filing of the Amended Consolidated Complaint to file an Answer or until 12/13/19 if plaintiff does not file an Amended Complaint. (Coll, A)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/28/2019 DENYING 82 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as to Plaintiff's first through fourth causes of action, and GRANTED with leave to amend Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's fifth cause of action for unjust enrichment. (Reader, L)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/12/2017 re Discovery. (Donati, J)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/15/17. (Kaminski, H)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order GRANTING Motions to Transfer 31 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The motions to transfer are GRANTED. The cases are transferred to the Eastern District of California, Sacramento Division. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (SEE MEMORANDUM FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) [Transferred from cacd on 4/18/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Los Angeles, et al. v. Sprint Solutions, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Eric J. Buescher
Represented By: Christopher Dolan
Represented By: Aimee Elizabeth Kirby
Represented By: Niall P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Knudsen
Represented By: Christopher Dolan
Represented By: Aimee Elizabeth Kirby
Represented By: Mark Allen Kleiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: William P. Ashworth, PHV
Represented By: John E. Joiner, PHV
Represented By: Anne Marilyn Kelts
Represented By: Colin Henry Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nextel of California, Inc.
Represented By: William P. Ashworth, PHV
Represented By: John E. Joiner, PHV
Represented By: Anne Marilyn Kelts
Represented By: Colin Henry Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?