Lindley v. KAG West, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Lindley
Defendant: KAG West, LLC and Keenan Advantage Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00825
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/20/2019 DISMISSING this case with prejudice as per 44 Stipulation. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/29/2018 GRANTING 38 Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Response to Summary Judgment is to be filed on or before 12/27/2018 and Defendants' Reply is to be filed on or before 1/14/2019. (Zignago, K.)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/6/2018 GRANTING 24 Motion for 90-Day Extension of Time. The discovery deadline within 3 Pretrial Scheduling Order shall be extended from 4/20/2018 to 7/20/2018. Additionally, this Court confirms that the deadline for filing dispositive motions is 1/31/2019. (Huang, H)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/23/18 GRANTING Defendant's Request to file Plaintiff's Medical Records and Declaration of Michael A. Curley under seal. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. n 12/4/2017. (York, M)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/27/17: Request for Bifurcated Discovery 17 is GRANTED. Request for oral argument 20 is DENIED. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindley v. KAG West, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lindley
Represented By: Gregory G. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAG West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keenan Advantage Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?