Valentine v. Sacramento Metropolitan Fire District
Plaintiff: |
Tracey Valentine |
Defendant: |
Sacramento Metropolitan Fire District |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00827 |
Filed: |
April 20, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 15, 2019 |
Filing
73
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 02/15/19 GRANTING 70 joint motion for approval of settlement agreement; GRANTING 59 parties' stipulation to allow Daniel Weld to be included as an individualplaintiff; and GRANTING 69 Stipulation to dismiss plaintiffs listed. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
|
August 16, 2018 |
Filing
68
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/16/2018 ORDERING that the 8/16/2018 deadline for a final disposition is VACATED; the deadline for the parties to file a Stipulation and Request for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of this case is 9/28/2018. (Reader, L)
|
July 13, 2018 |
Filing
66
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/12/2018 APPROVING 65 Stipulation and VACATING the 7/16/2018 deadline. The deadline for the Parties to file a Stipulation and Request for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of this case is 8/16/2018. (York, M)
|
May 15, 2018 |
Filing
64
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/14/2018 VACATING the 5/16/2018 deadline for final disposition. The deadline for the Parties to file a Stipulation and Request for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of this case is 7/16/2018. (York, M)
|
October 26, 2017 |
Filing
30
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/26/2017 ORDERING that a phone conference is set for 11/1/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Zignago, K.)
|
October 17, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER ON CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE TO POTENTIAL COLLECTIVE ACTION MEMBERS signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/16/17. The hearing scheduled for 10/20/17 is VACATED. Plaintiff Tracey Valentine is appointed collective action representative. Plaintiff's counsel, Mastagni Holstedt, APC, is appointed counsel for this collective action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
August 8, 2017 |
Filing
21
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/7/17 ORDERING the Settlement Conference is RESET for 11/9/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Becknal, R)
|
July 24, 2017 |
Filing
19
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/24/17 ORDERING that the Settlement Conference scheduled for 8/17/17 is CONTINUED to 12/7/2017. The deadline to submit settlement statements and file notices of submission is re-set to seven calendar days prior to the new settlement conference date. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?