Spagel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joshua Spagel
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00839
Filed: April 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Trinity
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/17/2018 ORDERING that Joshua Spagel is awarded attorney fees and expenses in the amount of two thousand five hundred dollars ($2,500.00) under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), and no costs under 28 U.S.C. § 1920. (Zignago, K.)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/14/2018 REVERSING and REMANDING for further administrative action. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/26/2018 ORDERING the deadline for Defendant's response to 18 Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 2/28/2018. (Washington, S)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/7/17 ORDERING the time for Defendant to file her Answer to the Complaint is RESET to 9/8/17.(Becknal, R)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/21/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve the 5 Scheduling Order in social security cases; ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the U.S. Marshal, within fou rteen (14) days, a completed 4 Summons and copies of the 1 Social Security Complaint and to file a statement with the court attesting to such service; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process without prepayment of costs within sixty (60) days. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spagel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Spagel
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Richard M. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?