Jenkins v. JP Morgan Chase Bank
Plaintiff: John Lamar Jenkins
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 2:2017cv00878
Filed: April 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/4/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/28/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Within 28 days, plaintiff shall either (a) pay the applicable filing fee or (b) file an amended application to proceed IFP that adequately demonstrates that plaintiff is unable to pay the filing fee. Plaintiff's failure to either pay the filing fee or file a sufficient IFP application by the above deadline will result in a recommendation that the action be dismissed. (Benson, A.)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 04/27/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's 3 Motion for TRO is DENIED without prejudice. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lamar Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?