L. et al v. Vacaville Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: J. L. and J. M.
Defendant: Vacaville Unified School District and Sacramento City Unified School District
Case Number: 2:2017cv00892
Filed: April 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/25/2018 GRANTING 29 Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise; J.M. is AUTHORIZED to, and shall, execute the Release on behalf of Plaintiff J.L.; Ruderman & Know, LLP is AUTHORIZED to use a portion of the net proceeds paid to J.L.'s client trust account to establish a special needs trust on behalf of J.L.; All dates are VACATED and the parties are ORDERED to file a Stipulation re dismissal of this case, or a status report, within 60 days. (Fabillaran, J)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 02/20/18 ORDERING that, pursuant to 21 Stipulation, the briefing schedule set forth in the 20 01/03/18 Order is MODIFIED as follows: Simultaneous cross-briefs due 03/29/18, Cross oppositions due 04/26/18, Cross replies due 05/10/18 and Hearing on 05/31/18. (Benson, A.)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/3/2018 ORDERING Pursuant to stipulation filed by the Parties, the briefing schedule set forth in the Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF Doc. 18 ) is modified as follows: Simultaneous cross-briefs due March 1, 2018; Cross oppositions due March 29, 2018; Cross replies due April 12, 2018; Hearing on May 3, 2018. (Becknal, R)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/26/17. All discovery shall be completed by 12/14/2018. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/14/2019. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 6/13/2019. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file their cross-briefs no later than 2/1/2018. Cross oppositions shall be filed no later than 3/1/2018. Cross replies sh all be filed no later than 3/15/2018. The hearing date for the cross motions shall be held on 4/5/2018, in Courtroom 2 at 2:00 P.M. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 9/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nu nley. The parties shall file, not later than 8/29/2019, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. The Jury Trial is SET for 11/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties estimate a trial length of three to seven (3-7) days. (Kastilahn, A)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/13/2017 ORDERING 7 that Plaintiff's Petition for an Order Appointing J.M. as guardian ad litem for J.L. is hereby GRANTED. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L. et al v. Vacaville Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. L.
Represented By: Daniel Robert Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. M.
Represented By: Daniel Robert Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacaville Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento City Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?