Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carl Edward Brown
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00896
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/28/2018 ORDERING the award of Attorney's fees under the EAJA. (Washington, S)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 02/19/18 REMANDING CASE for further administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Clerk to enter a final judgment in favor of Plaintiff, and against Defendant, reversing the final decision of the Commissioner. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/31/17, ORDERING that Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint to appeal only the Commissioner's denial of Plaintiff's application for disability insurance benefits under T itle II of the Social Security Act. After Plaintiff files the Amended Complaint, Defendant shall withdraw her 8 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file the administrative record and respond to the Amended Complaint within 90 days from the date of service of the Amended Complaint. All other deadlines in the Scheduling Order shall remain in effect. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Edward Brown
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Margaret Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?