Davis v. Office of the Public Defender et al
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Defendant: Office of the Public Defender and Michelle Shaffie
Case Number: 2:2017cv00924
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/11/2017 DISMISSING this action pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a). CASE CLOSED.(Yin, K)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/12/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Robert Davis. The Director of the CDCR shall collect monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial) (Henshaw, R)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/30/17 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/9/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a certified copy of his jail trust account statement.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Office of the Public Defender et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Public Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Shaffie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?