Randall v. Sacramento State Prison-Folsom
Plaintiff: Virgil Douglas Randall
Defendant: Sacramento State Prison-Folsom
Case Number: 2:2017cv00929
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/21/2019 RECOMMENDING plaintiff's 19 second amended complaint be dismissed; and this case be closed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/9/2018 VACATING the 14 Findings and Recommendations filed on 1/24/2018; plaintiff's amended complaint is DISMISSED; and plaintiff has 30 days to file a second amended complaint. (Yin, K)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/24/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to assign a district judge to this case and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/8/2017 GRANTING plaintiff 14 days to file an amended complaint in compliance with the court's 6/23/2017 order.(Yin, K)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/23/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING 1 Complaint. Plaintiff granted 30 days from date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is obligated to pay filing fee of $350. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/9/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a properly completed request to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/3/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall v. Sacramento State Prison-Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Douglas Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento State Prison-Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?