Linder v. Galang et al
Plaintiff: Duane Peyton Linder
Defendant: Carmalino Galang and San Joaquin General Hospital
Case Number: 2:2017cv00941
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/20/2018 RECOMMENDING that the instant action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/30/2018 WITHDRAWING the 13 findings and recommendations issued 1/10/2018 and CONSTRUING Plaintiff's objections to the findings and recommendations as a request for extended time to file a First Amended Complaint, which is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint within 30 days. The Clerk shall send plaintiff, together with a copy of this order, the following: (i) a copy of plaintiff's original complaint 1 ; (ii) a copy of this court's order filed 11/28/2017; and (iii) a blank complaint form.(Yin, K)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/10/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a district judge to this action and RECOMMENDING the instant action be dismissed. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Duane Peyton Linder signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/27/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linder v. Galang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Peyton Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmalino Galang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?