Linder v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Plaintiff: Duane Peyton Linder
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Case Number: 2:2017cv00943
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/7/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/17/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days. (Henshaw, R)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/20/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 15 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/1/2018 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Duane Peyton Linder. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linder v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Peyton Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?