Mehmood v. Sarani
Plaintiff: Yasir Mehmood
Defendant: Tabassum Sarani
Case Number: 2:2017cv00970
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/23/19 ORDERING defendant to file an opposition to 85 plaintiff's motion to stay. If defendant does not respond, the court will stay this action, with the parties to file status reports every 90 days. (Kastilahn, A)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/19/2019 EXTENDING the parties' deadline to file a final pretrial report to 10/8/2019. (Zignago, K.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/12/19 EXTENDING the parties deadline to 7/10/2019 to file a final pretrial status report. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/26/19 ADOPTING 73 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full; DENYING 72 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING Plaintiff's request for leave to file a Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to serve Plaintiff with a copy of the local rules. The clerk of the court is further DIRECTED to re-serve the items returned to the court as undeliverable on 1/29/18 and 2/5/18 on Plaintiff at his current address. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/11/19 ORDERING that no further dispositive motions by either party will be considered and RECOMMENDING that defendant's 72 Motion to Dismiss be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to these F&Rs due within 21 days. (Benson, A.)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/15/2019 ORDERING that the deadline to file a motion to dismiss or motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 2/13/2019, as to defendant only. If defendant does not file a dispositive motion, this matter will be set for a pre-trial conference and trial date before the district judge. The court will DISREGARD further dispositive motions from plaintiff. (Washington, S)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/7/2019 DENYING 66 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Huang, H)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/7/18 DENYING Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 58 , and motion to compel 62 . (Becknal, R)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/6/2018 VACATING 53 Motion for TRO. (Hunt, G)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/5/18 DENYING as moot 49 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME.(Kaminski, H).
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/29/2018 ADOPTING 41 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING 34 motion to recuse the assigned district judge. (York, M)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/11/18 ORDERING that defendant will have fourteen (14) days to file with the court the required certificate of service pursuant to Rule 5. (Becknal, R)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/19/2018 DENYING 34 Motion to Recuse, DENYING 33 Motion for Discovery and RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs motion to recuse the assigned district judge be denied. Objections due within twenty-one 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Hunt, G)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/13/2018 DENYING 31 Motion for Restraining Order. (Hunt, G)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DIRECTING SERVE BY U.S. MARSHAL WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COSTS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/17/18 ORDERING Clerk to forward service documents to USM; within 14 days, USM shall notify defendant Tabassum Sarani of the commencement of this action and request a waiver of service of summons. Clerk to send Local Rules (cc: USM). (Benson, A.)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/2/2018 VACATING 27 Motion for TRO; DENYING 26 Motion for Discovery; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to reserve copies of the summons form, together with a copy of this order on plaintiff; and Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete and submit a completed summons form to this court. (Washington, S)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/27/17, DENYING, as premature, Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Expedite and Issue Order. The Clerk is directed to update plaintiff's address to 18201 SW 12th St., Miami, FL, 33194. A courtesy copy of this Order shall also be sent to Yasir Mehmood at Palmetto Hospital, 2001 West 68th Street, Room 1027, Hialeah, FL 33016. (Kastilahn, A)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/12/17, GRANTING in PART Defendant's 15 motion to seal which is construed as a request to redact. The Clerk is directed to redact from the first amended complaint 8 dates of birth, leaving only the year, from page 22, and social security numbers, leaving only the last four, from page 30. The Clerk is directed to restrict access to the complaint 1 , to court personnel only. (Kastilahn, A)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of YASIR MEHMOODsigned by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/27/17. (cc: Glades County Detention Center, Financial) (Becknal, R)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/26/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made by Yasir Mehmood; Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee in accordance with the provisions of 28:1915(b)(1); all fees shall be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the Sheriff of Sacramento County; Service is appropriate for defendant: Tabassum Sarani; the Clerk of the Cour t shall send plaintiff one USM-285 form, one summons, a copy of the complaint filed 8/28/2017 8 , and an instruction sheet; within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Submission of Documents, and submit the following documents to the court.(Reader, L)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/16/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff will have until 9/17/2017 to file his amended complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff forms for filing a non- prisoner civil complaint.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/31/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DISMISSING the 1 Complaint with leave to amend; GRANTING the plaintiff 30 days to file an amended complaint; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehmood v. Sarani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabassum Sarani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasir Mehmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?