Storman v. Kaiser Health Plan et al

Plaintiff: Michael D. Storman
Defendant: Kaiser Health Plan and U.S. Office of the Secretary
Case Number: 2:2017cv00976
Filed: May 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/21/2018 ADOPTING 21 Findings and Recommendations in full. Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Relief from Judgment is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/6/18, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 19 motion for relief from judgment be DENIED. Matter REFERRED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, plaintiff may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/3/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion to Appeal Appointment of Counsel 13 is accordingly DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/21/2017 ORDERING that 17 Motion to Dismiss is construed as a notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice. All dates pending before the undersigned are VACATED. CASE CLOSED. (Hunt, G)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/5/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's motion for default judgment (ECF No. 14 ) is construed as a request for Clerk's Entry of Default. The Clerk of the Court is directed to make the determination required under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 55(a). (Becknal, R)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/20/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Counsel 10 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/8/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 3 motion to voluntarily dismiss defendant Kaiser Health Plan is GRANTED. The Cle rk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal (USM). The Clerk is directed to issue forthwith, all process pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4, without prepayment of costs. Plaintiff is directed to supply the USM, within 30 days from the date this order is filed, all information needed by the Marshal to effect service of process, and file astatement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs, not later than 60 days from the date of this order. Defendant is directed to file the administrative record and an answer or other response to the complaint within 90 days from the service of the complaint. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storman v. Kaiser Health Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Storman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Office of the Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?