Lee v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.
Plaintiff: Sarah R. Lee
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America and Winrock International Institute for Agricultural Development Long-Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 2:2017cv00978
Filed: May 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/10/2018 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED in its entirety as to all defendants, with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE STIPULATION regarding standard review signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/21/17. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court has accepted the Parties' stipulation and will employ the de novo standard of review in this case. IT IS FURTHER HEREBY ORDERED that no discovery will be conducted by the Parties in this case. This Order regarding the appropriate standard of review is specifically limited to the facts and circumstances of this particular case.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/25/2017 ORDERING defendant Winrock International Institute for Agricultural Development Long-Term Disability Plan be DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah R. Lee
Represented By: Lisa Serebin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jason A. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winrock International Institute for Agricultural Development Long-Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?