Browning v. Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Tobi Browning
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00979
Filed: May 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close Case 41 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/1/2018: The case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Denying 9 Motion to Stay and Denying 17 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/29/2017. (These related cases are referred to the assigned magistrate judge for Initial Scheduling Conference which is currently set for 2/14/2018 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 10.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER setting this matter for an Initial Scheduling Conference for 2/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean pursuant to the relating/reassignment of this matter to case nos. 1:17-CV-00643-DAD-EPG, 1:17-CV -00644-DAD-EPG, 1:17-CV-00645-DAD-EPG, 1:17-CV-00649-DAD-EPG, 1:17-CV-00655-DAD-EPG, 2:17-CV-00967-DAD-EPG, and 2:17-CV-00972-DAD-EPG. The Court further ORDERS any pending scheduling conference VACATED. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/4/2017. (Rooney, M)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/14/17 ORDERING that the hearing on the MOTION to STAY 9 is VACATED and will be heard with Defendant's anticipated MOTION to DISMISS Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on 10/3/2017 at 01:30 PM.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/17/2017 ORDERING Defendant Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a). (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browning v. Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobi Browning
Represented By: Joshua Branden Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?