Bowell v. California Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: James Bowell
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and J. Lewis
Case Number: 2:2017cv00981
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/5/2020 ADOPTING in FULL 80 Findings and Recommendations. GRANTING 56 Motion to Dismiss, and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/30/2020 GRANTING Defendants' motion 67 to strike; STRIKING Plaintiff's filings 65 66 ; and GRANTING Defendants' request for judicial not ice 56 ; and RECOMMENDING Defendants' motion to dismiss 56 be granted in part; Defendants be granted qualified immunity; and this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/26/2020 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 77 motion. (Yin, K)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/10/2020 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 73 Motion. (York, M)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/05/20 DENYING 69 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/3/2020 DENYING without prejudice 70 Motion. (Henshaw, R)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/29/19 PARTIALLY GRANTING 57 , 58 , 60 plaintiff's motions for extensions of time. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to file one opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed within 7 days thereafter. (Plummer, M)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/23/2019 RECOMMENDING defendants Dr. Fitter and PA Ha and plaintiff's putative state law claims against such defendants should be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/29/19 REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (cc: assigned Deputy Attorney General) (Plummer, M)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/26/19 ADOPTING 38 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 41 , 44 Motions for extension of time. This matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further pretrial proceedings. (Kaminski, H)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/23/2019 GRANTING the parties 30 days in which to file supplemental briefs. (Huang, H)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/01/19 GRANTING 35 Motion to Strike. The clerk of the court is directed to strike plaintiff's unauthorized sur-reply 34 . Also, RECOMMENDING that defend ants' motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status 28 be granted. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status 7 be revoked. Plaintiff be ordered to pay the $400.00 filing fee within 21 days from the date the district court adopts the instant findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/20/19 DENYING 27 plaintiff's motion and GRANTING 29 Motion for Extension. Defendants are relieved of their obligation to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint until further order of court. (Plummer, M)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/24/19 DENYING 25 plaintiff's second motion. (Plummer, M)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/10/2019 DENYING 23 Request for Reconsideration. (Huang, H)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/5/2017 PARTIALLY GRANTING 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff to file amended complaint within 60 days. (Henshaw, R)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of James Bowell signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/16/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/8/17. The Old Case Number is: 1:17-cv-0604-EPG. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowell v. California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?