Bontemps v. Arya et al
Plaintiff: |
Gregory C. Bontemps |
Defendant: |
Arya, Moghaddam and Soltanian |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00993 |
Filed: |
May 11, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Deborah Barnes |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 27, 2019 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/27/19 DISMISSING CASE for Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
February 7, 2019 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/7/2019 ORDERING that within 14 days of the date of service of this order, plaintiff shall pay the full filing fee of $400. (Huang, H)
|
June 26, 2018 |
Filing
17
ORDER ADOPTING 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in Full signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/25/2018. The court finds plaintiff has accrued 3 strikes under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) and that he has failed to demonstrate that, at the time he f iled his complaint, he was in imminent danger of serious physical injury; The Court denies Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 14 days, Plaintiff must pay the full filing fee of $400 if he wishes to proceed with this action. (Fabillaran, J)
|
June 1, 2018 |
Filing
14
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/31/18 ORDERING the clerk of court to assign a district judge to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that the court find plaintiff has accrued 3 strikes under 28 USC 191 5(g) for the reasons set forth in the court's 06/16/17 order 4 . The court find plaintiff failed to demonstrate that, at the time he filed his complaint, he was in imminent danger of serious physical injury, for the reasons set forth in the 7/06/17 order 7 . The court deny plaintiff's motion to proceed IFP 6 . Motion 6 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
August 2, 2017 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/1/2017 ORDERING case dismissed without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R)
|
July 6, 2017 |
Filing
7
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/5/2017 DENYING 6 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff to pay $400 in fees, within 14 days of the filed date of this order, to proceed with this action. (Henshaw, R)
|
June 16, 2017 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/15/2017 ORDERING within 30 days, plaintiff shall either (a) pay the $400.00 fee to proceed in this action, or (b) file an application to proceed ifp. If plaintiff chooses to file an ifp application, he must include a statement explaining whether he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?