Staychock et al v. Klean Kanteen, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Staychock and Kathleen Mackay Staychock
Defendant: Klean Kanteen, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01012
Filed: May 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/21/2018 ORDERING, pursuant to the joint request for dismissal, all claims, including all claims in the pending second amended complaint, and counterclaims asserted between the Staychocks and Klean Kanteen in this consolidated action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party is to bear their own costs, attorneys' fees, and expenses. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/19/2018 APPROVING 67 Stipulation and EXTENDING Time to Depose CertainFact Witnesses After the Fact Discovery Cut-Off. (York, M)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/11/18: The depositions of Richard Staychock, Kathleen Mackay Staychock, and Real Ware LLC shall be conducted after the current fact discovery cut-off of April 26, 2018, but before May 15, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/27/2018 REFERRING this matter back to the District Judge pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(21). (York, M)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/5/2018 ORDERING 31 the hearing scheduled for 2/14/2018 is hereby taken OFF calendar; Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is SUBMITTED on the record and briefs without oral argument. (Reader, L)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 01/26/18 GRANTING 32 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File Markman Brief; the deadlines are as follows: Defendant's opening Markman brief is due 02/23/18, plaintiff' Op position is due 03/09/18, with Defendant's Reply Brief due 03/16/18. The 02/22/18 claim construction hearing is VACATED. The parties are ordered to meet and confer and propose a new date for the claim construction hearing to be held on or after 04/01/18. (Benson, A.)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/12/17, GRANTING 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Skiermont is ORDERED to serve on the Staychocks a copy of this order and file proof of service with the court within seven days. Skie rmont must comply with all obligations under California Rule of Professional Conduct 3-700(D).The Staychocks are now proceeding pro se. The Clerk shall reflect as much on the court's docket. The case is REFERRED to the assigned magistrate judge for future proceedings. (Kastilahn, A)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/30/17 GRANTING plaintiffs' 14 Motion for Leave to Amend; plaintiffs shall file their Proposed FAC as the First Amended Complaint within 7 days. (Benson, A.)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER ESTABLISHING PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/12/2017. (Washington, S)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/21/17. Any stipulation or motion to amend plaintiffs' complaint shall be filed with the court no later than 10/9/2017. All Discovery shall be completed by 4/26/2018. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/16/2018, and rebuttal of expert disclosures due by 5/31/2018. All expert discovery shall be completed by 6/28/2018. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restrainingorders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 10/5/2018. Case Referred to VDRP. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staychock et al v. Klean Kanteen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Staychock
Represented By: Benjamin Simler, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Mackay Staychock
Represented By: Benjamin Simler, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klean Kanteen, Inc.
Represented By: Evan S. Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?