Powell v. Darling
Plaintiff: Michael Powell
Defendant: Tomery Powell (Darling)
Case Number: 2:2017cv01035
Filed: May 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/3/2017 ADOPTING in FULL 3 Findings and Recommendations; REMANDING CASE to Superior Court of California, County of Placer. Copy of remand order sent to other court. DENYING as MOOT 4 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING as MOOT 6 Motion for Judgment. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/18/17 Recommending that this Action be summarily remanded to the Superior Court of California, County of Placer re 1 Notice of Removal. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to these F&R due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/21/2017 ORDERING that defendant SHOW CAUSE within 14 days why this case should not be remanded to state court for untimely removal under 28 U.S.C. § 1446(b). (Zignago, K.)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/31/2017 DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and RECOMMENDING that this action be summarily remanded to the Superior Court of California, County of Placer. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomery Powell (Darling)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?