McElroy v. Warden et al
Plaintiff: |
Latwahn McElroy |
Defendant: |
Warden, Youssef and CDCR |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01042 |
Filed: |
May 17, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
San Joaquin |
Presiding Judge: |
Allison Claire |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 15, 2018 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/13/18, ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
|
February 14, 2018 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/13/2018 ADOPTING 16 findings and recommendations in full. Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Proceed IFP is DENIED. Plaintiff is accorded fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to submit the full filing fee ($400.00) in order to proceed with this action. If Plaintiff fails to timely submit the full filing fee, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to the parties. (Zignago, K.)
|
February 8, 2018 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/8/2018 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 17 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
|
January 3, 2018 |
Filing
16
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/02/18 DENYING AS MOOT 4 , 5 , 6 Motions for court intervention and DENYING AS PREMATURE 15 Motion for court intervention. The clerk of the court is directed to randomly assign a District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 12 be denied under 28 U.S.C. 67; 1915(g). Plaintiff be accorded 14 days after the district judge adopts these findings and recommendations to submit the full filing fee $400.00 in order to proceed with this action. If plaintiff fails to timely submit the full filing fee, this action should be dismissed without prejudice. Motion 12 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M) Modified on 1/3/2018 (Plummer, M).
|
July 14, 2017 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/13/2017 DENYING 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel and GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an application to proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R)
|
June 22, 2017 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/21/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an application to proceed IFP or the required fees of $400. (Henshaw, R)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?